Javatpoint Logo
Javatpoint Logo

Numbers Aptitude Test Paper 4


16) Which of the following is the output of 495 * 495 - 105 * 105?

  1. 234000
  2. 360000
  3. 300000
  4. 350000

The Correct answer is (A)

Answer with explanation:

Apply formula; (a2 - b2) = (a - b) (a+b)

495 x 495 - 105 x 105

= (4952 - 1052)

= (495 - 105) (495 + 105)

= 390 * 600

= 234000


17) What is the unit digit in the product of 853 * 1346 * 452 * 226?

  1. 4
  2. 5
  3. 6
  4. 8

The Correct answer is (C)

Answer with explanation:

Pick up the unit digit of each number and multiply them;

3 in 853

6 in 1346

2 in 452

6 in 226

∴3 * 6 * 2 * 6 = 216 (consider the unit digit in the product)

So, the unit digit in the product of 853 * 1346 * 452 * 226 is 6.


18) If two-third of three-fourth of a number is 34, find the 20% of that number?

  1. 13
  2. 13.6
  3. 14
  4. 14.6

The Correct answer is (B)

Answer with explanation:

Let the number is X.

As per question;

Number4

19) What is the sum of all odd numbers up to 240?

  1. 14400
  2. 13400
  3. 12400
  4. 11400

The Correct answer is (A)

Answer with explanation:

Number of odd numbers up to 240 =2402= 120

Sum of first n odd numbers = n2

n = 120

Required sum = 1202 = 14400


20) What are the different prime factors of 2400?

  1. 2
  2. 3
  3. 4
  4. 5

The Correct answer is (B)

Answer with explanation:

L.C.M of 2400 = 2 x 2 x 2 x 2 x 2 x 3 x 5 x 5

The different prime factors are 3 (2, 3 and 5).






Please Share

facebook twitter google plus pinterest

Learn Latest Tutorials


Preparation


Trending Technologies


B.Tech / MCA